EP0337425 - Antirust additives for lubricants or greases based on perfluoropolyethers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUSIMONT S.r.l. Foro Buonaparte, 31 I-20100 Milano / IT | [1989/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strepparola, Ezio 6, Viale Partigiano I-24047 Treviglio Bergamo / IT | 02 /
Gavezotti, Piero 9, Via Cimabue I-20100 Milan / IT | 03 /
Corti, Costante 1, Via F. Chopin I-20100 Milan / IT | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/42] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold, Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert, Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89106508.8 | 12.04.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | IT19880020183 | 13.04.1988 Original published format: IT 2018388 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0337425 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0337425 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/04, // (C10M169/04, 107:38, 149:00, 151:00), C10N30:10 | [1989/42] | CPC: |
C10M149/12 (EP);
C10M107/38 (EP);
C10M147/04 (EP);
C10M151/04 (EP);
C10M169/04 (EP);
C10M169/041 (EP);
C10M2211/044 (EP);
C10M2211/06 (EP);
C10M2213/00 (EP);
C10M2213/023 (EP);
C10M2213/04 (EP);
C10M2213/043 (EP);
C10M2213/06 (EP);
C10M2213/0606 (EP);
C10M2213/0623 (EP);
C10M2215/04 (EP);
C10M2215/16 (EP);
C10M2215/26 (EP);
C10M2217/00 (EP);
C10M2217/02 (EP);
C10M2217/04 (EP);
C10M2217/046 (EP);
C10M2217/06 (EP);
C10M2221/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/42] | Title | German: | Antirostadditive für Schmiermittel oder Schmierfette mit Perfluoropolyäthern als Basismaterial | [1989/42] | English: | Antirust additives for lubricants or greases based on perfluoropolyethers | [1989/42] | French: | Additifs antirouilles pour lubrifiants ou graisses à base de perfluoropolyéthers | [1989/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 26.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2632837 (LAGOW RICHARD J, et al); | [X]US4085137 (ZOLLINGER JOSEPH LAMAR [US], et al); | [A]US4132660 (CHRISTIAN JOHN B, et al); | [A]US4194983 (ITO THOMAS I [US], et al); | [A]US4404377 (SEALE VIRGIL L [US], et al) |