EP0337439 - Fixed cylinder type radial piston pump with volume control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. No.2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama City / JP | [1989/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamuro, Sigeaki No. 3-11-41, Ikego Zushi City / JP | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89106542.7 | 12.04.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | JP19880088909 | 13.04.1988 Original published format: JP 8890988 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0337439 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0337439 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/06 | [1989/42] | CPC: |
F04B49/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1989/42] | Title | German: | Radialkolbenpumpe mit feststehenden Zylindern mit einer Vorrichtung zur Regelung der Fördermenge | [1989/42] | English: | Fixed cylinder type radial piston pump with volume control apparatus | [1989/42] | French: | Pompe à pistons radiaux à cylindres immobiles avec dispositif pour commande de refoulement | [1989/42] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 27.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/37] | 19.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2946746 ; | [Y]DE2951012 ; | [X]DE1653379 |