EP0338470 - Method of producing imide bond-containing resins and flame retardants comprising said resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai-Ichi Kogyo Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 55 Nishishichijo Higashikubo-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states DAI-ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 55 Nishishichijo Higashikubo-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniuchi, Akira 12-6 Daigo Furumichicho Fushimi-ku Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Niwa, Koichi 11 Katagihara Enomotocho Nishikyo-ku Kyoto / JP | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89106801.7 | 17.04.1989 | [1989/43] | Priority number, date | JP19880098938 | 21.04.1988 Original published format: JP 9893888 | [1989/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0338470 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0338470 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338470 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/30 | [1989/43] | CPC: |
C08F8/30 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2800/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/32, C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C08F8/32, C08F222/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1989/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Imidbindungen enthaltenden Harzen und diese Harze enthaltende Flammschutzmittel | [1989/43] | English: | Method of producing imide bond-containing resins and flame retardants comprising said resins | [1989/43] | French: | Procédé de préparation de résines contenant des liaisons imides et retardeurs de flamme renfermant ces résines | [1989/43] | Examination procedure | 21.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 27.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/50] | Request for further processing for: | 13.06.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3933700 (ALLEN JOHN K); | [A]EP0175897 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]EP0190507 (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO [US]) | Examination | EP0326163 |