EP0339415 - Aqueous cellulose ester dispersions and their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolff Walsrode Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 15 15 D-29655 Walsrode / DE | [1989/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoppe, Lutz, Dr. Am Badeteich 8 D-3030 Walsrode / DE | 02 /
Koch, Wolfgang, Dr. An der Warnau 40 D-3036 Bomlitz / DE | 03 /
Lühmann, Erhard Kastanienweg 2 D-3036 Bomlitz / DE | 04 /
Piepho, Michael, Dr. Fichtenweg 10 D-3032 Fallingbostel 2 / DE | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1989/44] | Zobel, Manfred, Dr., et al BAYER AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89106815.7 | 17.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | DE19883814284 | 28.04.1988 Original published format: DE 3814284 | [1989/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0339415 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0339415 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0339415 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F251/02, C08F220/12 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
C08F251/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F251/02, C08F220/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/44] | Title | German: | Wässrige Celluloseesterdispersionen und ihre Herstellung | [1989/44] | English: | Aqueous cellulose ester dispersions and their preparation | [1989/44] | French: | Dispersions aqueuses d'ester de cellulose et leur préparation | [1989/44] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 19.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP74115126 ; | [Y]US4435531 (NAKAYAMA YASUHARU [JP], et al); | [YD]US4011388 (MURPHY CHARLES VINCENT [US], et al); | [A]GB2090839 (DAICEL CHEM) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 83, 1975, Seite 81, Zusammenfassung Nr. 44843r, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-74 115 126 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) 02-11-1974, & JP74115126 A 00000000 |