Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0394500
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.07.2008 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
30.07.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
28.03.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] |
12.07.1995 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] |
11.03.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] |
22.12.1993 |
Opposition filed |
published on 09.02.1994 [1994/06] |
19.11.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] |
06.10.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] |
24.09.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] |
22.09.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] |
29.01.1993 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] |
16.07.1992 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] |
10.01.1992 |
First examination report |
|
15.09.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] |
15.09.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] |