Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0394501 | Global Dossier | 07.10.1992 | B1 | EP0394501 | 31.10.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP89106820 | 17.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE81334T | 15.10.1992 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP89106820 | 17.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2014482 | 17.10.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP89106819 | 17.04.1989 | EP89106820 | 17.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE58902426D1 | 12.11.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP89106820 | 17.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2056143T | 01.10.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP89106820 | 17.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH02293371 | 04.12.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | EP89106819 | 17.04.1989 | EP89106820 | 17.04.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0394500 | Global Dossier | 17.03.1993 | B1 | EP0394500 | 31.10.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP89106819 | 17.04.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE86955T | 15.04.1993 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP89106819 | 17.04.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE58903831D1 | 22.04.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP89106819 | 17.04.1989 |