EP0394500 - Process for the production of sintered alpha-alumina bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.C. Starck GmbH & Co. KG Im Schleeke 78-91 38642 Goslar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states H.C. Starck GmbH & Co. KG Im Schleeke 78-91 D-38642 Goslar / DE | ||
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states Hermann C. Starck Berlin GmbH & Co. KG Eschenallee 36 D-14050 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möltgen, Paul, Dr. Steigmattstrasse 2 D-7887 Laufenburg / DE | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Steiling, Lothar, et al Bayer AG BAG-LP-IPM Gebäude Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | Steiling, Lothar, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernzentrale RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89106819.9 | 17.04.1989 | [1990/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394500 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394500 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/10, C01F7/02, C09K3/14 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
C04B35/1115 (EP);
C01F7/02 (EP);
C09K3/1409 (EP);
C01P2004/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von alpha-A1203-Sinterkörpern | [1990/44] | English: | Process for the production of sintered alpha-alumina bodies | [1990/44] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de corps frittes en alumine alpha | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1989 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 16.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1993
Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1993
Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1993
Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | 20.01.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.06.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.06.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.03.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.04.1995 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.03.1993 | GB | 17.03.1993 | NL | 17.03.1993 | SE | 17.03.1993 | CH | 30.04.1993 | LI | 30.04.1993 | ES | 18.06.1993 | [2004/38] |
Former [1994/18] | BE | 17.03.1993 | |
GB | 17.03.1993 | ||
NL | 17.03.1993 | ||
SE | 17.03.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | BE | 17.03.1993 | |
GB | 17.03.1993 | ||
NL | 17.03.1993 | ||
SE | 17.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/47] | BE | 17.03.1993 | |
NL | 17.03.1993 | ||
SE | 17.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/46] | NL | 17.03.1993 | |
SE | 17.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/45] | NL | 17.03.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2915365 (FERNAND SAUSSOL); | [A]US3226191 (OSMENT HARRY E, et al); | [A]EP0227374 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [AD]US4797139 (BAUER RALPH [CA]) |