EP0338522 - High temperature SiC thin film thermistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagai, Takeshi 1-4-5, Nakayamadai Kawai-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Itoh, Masahiko 527-2, Shikishima-cho 2-chome Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89106962.7 | 19.04.1989 | [1989/43] | Priority number, date | JP19880098633 | 21.04.1988 Original published format: JP 9863388 | [1989/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0338522 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0338522 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338522 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/04, H01C17/12, H01C1/14 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
H01C7/008 (EP,US);
A24D3/00 (KR);
H01C1/1406 (EP,US);
H01C1/1413 (EP,US);
H01C17/12 (EP,US);
H01C7/02 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1989/43] | H01C7/00, H01C17/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1989/43] | Title | German: | Dünnschicht-SiC-Thermistor für hohe Temperatur | [1989/43] | English: | High temperature SiC thin film thermistor | [1989/43] | French: | Thermistance en film mince de SiC pour haute température | [1989/43] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/43] | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2061002 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |