EP0339469 - Method for the utilisation of a telephone exchange with a central signalization channel for the casting of votes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beckh, Horst von-Frays-Strasse 68 D-8000 München 60 / DE | [1989/44] | Application number, filing date | 89107048.4 | 19.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | DE19883814064 | 26.04.1988 Original published format: DE 3814064 | [1989/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0339469 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0339469 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0339469 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00, H04M11/00, H04M3/42, H04M7/06 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
G07C13/00 (EP,US);
H04M11/00 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0016 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/44] | H04Q3/00, H04M3/42, H04M11/00, H04M7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einsatz einer Fernsprechanlage mit zentralem Zeichengabekanal für die Abgabe von Voten | [1989/44] | English: | Method for the utilisation of a telephone exchange with a central signalization channel for the casting of votes | [1989/44] | French: | Méthode pour l'utilisation d'un central téléphonique à canal de signalisation centrale pour émettre des votes | [1989/44] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3950618 (BLOISI ALBERTONI DE LEMOS) | [Y] - 2ND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SUBSCRIBER LOOPS AND SERVICES, Eindhoven, 3. - 7. Mai 1976, Seiten 97-101; P. PARKINSON: "Incasting" | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM, Florence, 7. - 11. Mai 1984, session 43B Paper 3, Seiten 1-7; J. VAN WALLE et al.: "Centralized operation, maintenance and call charge recording" | [A] - INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUMICATIONS, Seattle, Washington, 11. - 13. Juni 1973, Seiten 44-7 - 44-12; P.J. BRENDEL: "Incasting and the telephone network" |