EP0339491 - A method for the packaging of oil, in particular edible oil, in flexible packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB PROFOR Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states AB PROFOR Ruben Rausings gata S-221 86 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wartenberg, Erwin, Dr. In den Brunnenwiesen 6 D-7000 Stuttgart 71 / DE | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61 D-80085 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89107128.4 | 20.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | SE19880001592 | 28.04.1988 Original published format: SE 8801592 | [1989/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0339491 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0339491 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0339491 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A23D7/06 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
B65B31/006 (EP);
A23D9/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/44] | A23D5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verpacken von Öl, insbesondere essbarem Öl, in flexiblen Verpackungen | [1989/44] | English: | A method for the packaging of oil, in particular edible oil, in flexible packages | [1989/44] | French: | Procédé de conditionnement d'huile, particulièrement d'huile comestible, dans des emballages flexibles | [1989/44] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 11.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1992
28.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Schaefer, Gerhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | 02
19.06.1992
29.06.1992
ADMISSIBLE PKL Verpackungssysteme GmbH Rurstr. 58 5172 Linnich / DE Opponent's representative Knauf, Rudolf COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1992
28.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
02
19.06.1992
29.06.1992
ADMISSIBLE PKL Verpackungssysteme GmbH Rurstr. 58 5172 Linnich / DE Opponent's representative Knauf, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [1992/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1992
28.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | 02.09.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.02.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 10.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.01.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.03.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.03.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.03.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.09.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 18.09.1991 | [1992/20] | Documents cited: | Search | FR573718 [ ]; | DE2039392 [ ] (UNILEVER NV) | [ ] - Journal of the American Oil Chemists Society, Vol 61, No. 3, March 1984, K. WARNER et al "Flavor and Oxidative Stability of Hydrogenated and Unhydrogenated Soybean Oils. Efficacy of Plastic Packaging". | [ ] - Netherland Milk Dairy Journal 27, 1973 p 379-398, C. KEHAGIAS et al "Storage of Butler Oil Under Various Conditions" |