EP0345447 - Self-bonding silicone caulking compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stein, Judith 1005 Union Street Schenectady New York 12308 / US | 02 /
Leonard, Tracy Mayne 2215 Huntridge drive Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18, rue Horace Vernet 92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89107216.7 | 21.04.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | US19880200478 | 31.05.1988 Original published format: US 200478 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0345447 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0345447 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/04, C08K5/54 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
C08K5/5455 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/5455, C08L83/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Selbstklebende Dichtmasse auf der Basis von Silikonen | [1989/50] | English: | Self-bonding silicone caulking compositions | [1989/50] | French: | Matière de calfatage autoadhésive à base de siloxanes | [1989/50] | File destroyed: | 15.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/12] | 23.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.08.1991 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3664997 (CHADHA RAJENDRA NATH, et al); | [AD]US4506058 (ASHBY BRUCE A [US], et al); | [A]EP0201284 (DOW CORNING [US]) |