EP0334390 - Numbered documents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMAS DE LA RUE & COMPANY LIMITED 6 Agar Street London WC2N 4DE / GB | [1992/45] |
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states THOMAS DE LA RUE & COMPANY LIMITED De La Rue House 3/5 Burlington Gardens GB-London W1A 1DL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitehead, Colin John 16 Willowside Woodley Reading Berks. RG5 4HJ / GB | 02 /
Haslop, John Martin 22 Radcott Close Woodley Reading Berks. / GB | 03 /
Bratchley, Robin 30 Bingley Grove Woodley Reading Berks. RG5 4TT / GB | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89107409.8 | 24.04.1985 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | GB19840010918 | 27.04.1984 Original published format: GB 8410918 | [1989/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0334390 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0334390 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334390 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0334390 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
G07D7/0047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/39] | Title | German: | Numerierte Dokumente | [1989/39] | English: | Numbered documents | [1989/39] | French: | Documents numérotés | [1989/39] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 24.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP85302866.0 / EP0160504 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.1995
04.04.1995
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.1995
04.04.1995
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 D-81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | 27.04.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.07.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.02.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.03.1997 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.10.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 04.06.1996 | Appeal received No. T0519/96 | 26.07.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.03.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1177718 ; | [Y]US2085023 (HUSTED HARRY A); | [Y]DE74923 ; | [A]US2850819 (PAYNE ALBERT E) |