EP0339555 - Water soluble preparations of coccidiostatics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiller, Dietrich, Dr. Riederbergstrasse 11 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
Hornykiewytsch, Theopil, Dr. Johannesallee 28 D-6230 Frankfurt am Main 80 / DE | 03 /
Raether, Wolfgang, Dr. Falkensteinstrasse 6 D-6072 Dreieich / DE | [1989/44] | Application number, filing date | 89107413.0 | 25.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | DE19883814323 | 28.04.1988 Original published format: DE 3814323 | [1989/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0339555 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0339555 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0339555 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/53, A61K9/08, A61K47/22 | [1992/52] | CPC: |
A61K31/53 (EP,KR);
A23K20/116 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K47/20 (EP);
A61K47/26 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/44] | A61K31/53, A61K9/08, A61K47/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/44] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche Zubereitungen von Coccidiostatica | [1989/44] | English: | Water soluble preparations of coccidiostatics | [1989/44] | French: | Préparations hydrosolubles de coccidiostatiques | [1989/44] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3361627 (CAMPBELL WALTER R); | [Y]EP0116175 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [YD]EP0154885 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0179583 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [YD]EP0215354 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |