EP0342418 - Apparatus for wrapping and closing a book package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PUSSIKESKUS OY Valuraudantie 23 00700 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | For all designated states PUSSIKESKUS OY Valuraudantie 23 SF-00700 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veikko, Ilmari Janhonen Längvik SF-02420 Jorvas / FI | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | Wehnert, Werner, et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [2010/01] |
Former [1989/47] | Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. Döring Dr.rer.nat. Beines Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89107777.8 | 28.04.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | FI19880002347 | 19.05.1988 Original published format: FI 882347 | [1989/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0342418 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0342418 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/02, B65B13/02 | [1989/47] | CPC: |
B65B13/02 (EP,US);
B65B11/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Wickeln und Verschliessen einer Buchverpackung | [1989/47] | English: | Apparatus for wrapping and closing a book package | [1989/47] | French: | Appareil pour envelopper et fermer un emballage pour livre | [1989/47] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 26.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.09.1992 | BE | 02.09.1992 | CH | 02.09.1992 | DE | 02.09.1992 | ES | 02.09.1992 | FR | 02.09.1992 | IT | 02.09.1992 | LI | 02.09.1992 | NL | 02.09.1992 | SE | 02.09.1992 | GB | 28.04.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 02.09.1992 | |
BE | 02.09.1992 | ||
CH | 02.09.1992 | ||
DE | 02.09.1992 | ||
ES | 02.09.1992 | ||
IT | 02.09.1992 | ||
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
FR | 22.01.1993 | ||
GB | 28.04.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.09.1992 | |
BE | 02.09.1992 | ||
CH | 02.09.1992 | ||
DE | 02.09.1992 | ||
IT | 02.09.1992 | ||
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
FR | 22.01.1993 | ||
GB | 28.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | AT | 02.09.1992 | |
BE | 02.09.1992 | ||
CH | 02.09.1992 | ||
DE | 02.09.1992 | ||
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
FR | 22.01.1993 | ||
GB | 28.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 02.09.1992 | |
BE | 02.09.1992 | ||
CH | 02.09.1992 | ||
DE | 02.09.1992 | ||
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
FR | 22.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/26] | BE | 02.09.1992 | |
CH | 02.09.1992 | ||
DE | 02.09.1992 | ||
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
FR | 22.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/19] | BE | 02.09.1992 | |
CH | 02.09.1992 | ||
DE | 02.09.1992 | ||
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | CH | 02.09.1992 | |
DE | 02.09.1992 | ||
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | CH | 02.09.1992 | |
DE | 02.09.1992 | ||
LI | 02.09.1992 | ||
NL | 02.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | CH | 02.09.1992 | |
LI | 02.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1530977 (ELLEN BRADY, et al); | [A]GB988736 (METAVERPA NV); | [A]DE2017251 |