EP0342425 - Closing mechanism of an injection-moulding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.12.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engel Maschinenbau Gesellschaft m.b.H. A-4311 Schwertberg / AT | [1989/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leonhartsberger, Heinrich Pergerstrasse 13 A-4311 Schwertberg / AT | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | Hofinger, Engelbert, et al Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | Hofinger, Engelbert, DDr., et al Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 89107853.7 | 29.04.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | AT19880001305 | 19.05.1988 Original published format: AT 130588 | [1989/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0342425 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0342425 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/67 | [1989/47] | CPC: |
B29C45/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/47] | Title | German: | Schliessmechanismus einer Spritzgiessmaschine | [1989/47] | English: | Closing mechanism of an injection-moulding machine | [1989/47] | French: | Mécanisme de fermeture d'une machine à mouler par injection | [1989/47] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 05.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/04] | 10.09.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB642708 (DOUGLAS ANDERSON); | [X]FR875882 (JOSEF POLAK ING); | [A]FR2178002 (BYGG OCH TRANSPORTEKONOMIE AB [SE]); | [A]FR2391844 (MANCEAU MARCEL [FR]) |