EP0349728 - Manufacturing method of a fine particle superconducting oxide powder and manufacturing method of a superconducting product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/02] | Manufacturing method of superconducting material and product and superconducting material | ||
[1995/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hosokawa Micron Corporation 5-go, 14-ban, 2-chome Ichioka Minato-ku Osaka / JP | [1990/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosokawa, Masuo 3-11-3, Uenohigashi Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Naito, Makio Berumezon 3-211 1-29-12, Machikuzuha Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Yoshikawa, Masahiro 1-46-1, Higashiyama Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Yokoyama, Tohei 2-1-29, Sakae Kumiyama-cho Kuse-gun Kyoto-fu / JP | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 D-81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108267.9 | 08.05.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | JP19880169475 | 07.07.1988 Original published format: JP 16947588 | JP19880171500 | 08.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17150088 | JP19880208676 | 23.08.1988 Original published format: JP 20867688 | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0349728 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0349728 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349728 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24, C04B35/00 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
C04B35/45 (EP,KR,US);
H10N60/0268 (EP,US);
Y10S505/786 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/02] | Title | German: | Herstellungsmethode von feinkörnigem supraleitenden Oxidpulver und Herstellungsmethode eines supraleitenden Artikels | [1995/50] | English: | Manufacturing method of a fine particle superconducting oxide powder and manufacturing method of a superconducting product | [1995/50] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une poudre d'oxyde supraconducteur à particules fines et procédé de fabrication d'un produit supraconducteur | [1995/50] |
Former [1990/02] | Herstellungsmethode von supraleitendem Material und Artikel | ||
Former [1990/02] | Manufacturing method of superconducting material and product and superconducting material | ||
Former [1990/02] | Procédé de fabrication d'un matériau supraconducteur et produit | Examination procedure | 08.05.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2522988 [ ] (HOSOKAWA MICRON KK [JP]); | [XP]EP0292126 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) | [X] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, Vol. 52, No. 19, May 9, 1988, pages 1628-1630, New York, US; S. JIN et al.: "Superconductivity in the Bi-Sr-Ca-Cu-O compounds with noble metal additions", page 1628, paragraphs 3-5; page 1629, paragraphs 2-5. | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, Vol. 71, No. 7, July 1988, pages C329-C331, New York, US; S.X. DOU et al.: "Effect of milling medium on the properties of superconducting YBa2Cu307-x", page C330, figure 1, paragraph 1; page C331, paragraph 4. | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, Vol. 26, No. 10, October 1987, pages L1653-L1656, Tokyo, JP; O. KOHNO et al.: "Critical current density of Y-Ba-Cu oxide wires", page L1653, paragraphs 2-4; page L1655, paragraph 3. |