EP0341700 - Image input apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyakawa, Tadashi 798, Miyanodai,Kaisei-Machi Ashigara-Kamigun Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Iba, Kunio 508-2,Ochiai,Tama-shi Tokyo / JP | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/46] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108436.0 | 10.05.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | JP19880113319 | 10.05.1988 Original published format: JP 11331988 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0341700 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0341700 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341700 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/217 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
H04N25/701 (EP,US);
H04N25/68 (US);
H04N25/69 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/46] | Title | German: | Bildeingangsapparat | [1989/46] | English: | Image input apparatus | [1989/46] | French: | Appareil de prise d'image | [1989/46] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 28.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4253120 (LEVINE PETER A); | [A]WO8403018 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]EP0222548 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]); | [A]US4701784 (MATSUOKA HIROKI [JP], et al) |