EP0342536 - Thienyl-piperazinones, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASSELLA Aktiengesellschaft Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | [1989/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schönafinger, Karl, Dr. Holunderweg 8 d-8755 Alzenau / DE | 02 /
Beyerle, Rudi, Dr. An der Pfaffenmauer 44 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 60 / DE | 03 /
Schindler, Ursula, Dr. Reinhardswaldweg 1 D-6082 Mörfelden-Walldorf 2 / DE | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | Urbach, Hans-Georg, et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 60386 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | Urbach, Hans-Georg, Dr., et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108550.8 | 12.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | DE19883817198 | 20.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3817198 | [1989/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0342536 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0342536 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/04, // A61K31/50 ,(C07D409/04, 333:00, 241:00) | [1989/47] | CPC: |
C07D409/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/47] | Title | German: | Thienyl-Piperazinone, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1989/47] | English: | Thienyl-piperazinones, their preparation and use | [1989/47] | French: | Thienyl-piperaziones. leur préparation et application | [1989/47] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 20.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.09.1992 | AT | 12.05.1993 | GB | 12.05.1993 | ES | 13.05.1993 | SE | 13.05.1993 | BE | 31.05.1993 | CH | 31.05.1993 | LI | 31.05.1993 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 23.09.1992 | |
AT | 12.05.1993 | ||
GB | 12.05.1993 | ||
SE | 13.05.1993 | ||
BE | 31.05.1993 | ||
CH | 31.05.1993 | ||
LI | 31.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 12.05.1993 | |
GB | 12.05.1993 | ||
SE | 13.05.1993 | ||
BE | 31.05.1993 | ||
CH | 31.05.1993 | ||
LI | 31.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | GB | 12.05.1993 | |
SE | 13.05.1993 | ||
BE | 31.05.1993 | ||
CH | 31.05.1993 | ||
LI | 31.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | GB | 12.05.1993 | |
SE | 13.05.1993 | ||
CH | 31.05.1993 | ||
LI | 31.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | SE | 13.05.1993 | |
CH | 31.05.1993 | ||
LI | 31.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/16] | SE | 13.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | US2653153 [ ] (DE BENNEVILLE PETER L); | DE1197089 [ ] (RICHARDSON MERRELL INC); | EP0072932 [ ] (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG [DE]) |