EP0345482 - Coaxial-antenna selector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 CH-5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davcev, Stojan Vladimir Komarov 40/1/7 Skopie / YU | [1989/50] | Application number, filing date | 89108551.6 | 12.05.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | CH19880002179 | 08.06.1988 Original published format: CH 217988 | [1989/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0345482 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/12 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
H01P1/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1989/50] | Title | German: | Koaxialer Antennenwähler | [1989/50] | English: | Coaxial-antenna selector | [1989/50] | French: | Sélecteur d'antenne coaxial | [1989/50] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/28] | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/37] | 29.04.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0044099 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [A]GB927388 (CONTINENTAL ELECTRONICS MFG); | [A]EP0003463 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]GB2127369 (MARCONI AVIONICS); | [A]US2519933 (ROUAULT CHARLES L) |