EP0342546 - Depilatory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPROVER CORPORATION P.O. Box 8807 Edificio Eastren Ave Federico Boyd Panama / PA | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | For all designated states IMPROVER CORPORATION P.O. Box 8807 Edificio Eastren Ave Federico Boyd Panama / PA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daar, Yair Moshav Galia / IL | 02 /
Yahav, Shimon 90 Tchernokovsky Street Rehovot / IL | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108602.7 | 12.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | IL19470000864 | 19.05.1988 Original published format: IL 86447 | [1989/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0342546 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0342546 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A45D26/00 | [1989/47] | CPC: |
A45D26/0023 (EP,US);
A45D26/0038 (EP,US);
A45D26/0042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/47] | Title | German: | Enthaarungsvorrichtung | [1989/47] | English: | Depilatory device | [1989/47] | French: | Dispositif pour épiler | [1989/47] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 01.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/30] | 28.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR737028 ; | [A]US2638623 (HANSCOM HARRIS F); | [A]GB788072 (ANTHONY GEORGE BUDD); | [A]FR2245314 (AMSTUTZ DANIEL [FR]) |