EP0342560 - Articulated arm lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARTEMIDE S.p.A. Via Monte Napoleone, 18 I-20121 Milan / IT | [1989/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gismondi, Ernesto Piazza San Nazaro in Brolo 15 I-20122 Milano / IT | 02 /
Bissell, John T. 1654 Stearns Dr. Los Angeles, CA 90035 / US | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89108642.3 | 13.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | IT19880020679 | 20.05.1988 Original published format: IT 2067988 | [1989/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0342560 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0342560 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/26 | [1989/47] | CPC: |
F16M11/10 (EP,US);
F16M11/2021 (EP,US);
F21S6/003 (EP,US);
F21V21/26 (EP,US);
F16M2200/044 (EP,US);
F16M2200/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [1989/47] | Title | German: | Gestängeleuchte | [1989/47] | English: | Articulated arm lamp | [1989/47] | French: | Lampe à bras articulé | [1989/47] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 20.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 22.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/09] | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2154041 (ORAM JOHN); | [Y]DE2605126 (THIELE HELMUT); | [Y]DE3308337 (FUSS RAINER); | [A]EP0255253 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) |