EP0350593 - Electronic package with heat spreader member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anschel, Morris 4612 Salem Drive Binghamton New York 13903 / US | 02 /
Sammakia, Bahgat Ghaleb 834 Oakdale Rd. Johnson City New York 13790 / US | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1990/03] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108688.6 | 13.05.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | US19880218725 | 13.07.1988 Original published format: US 218725 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0350593 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0350593 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0350593 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/36, H01L23/42 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
H01L23/3675 (EP,US);
H01L23/3737 (EP,US);
H01L23/433 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16152 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/03] | H01L23/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/03] | Title | German: | Elektronische Vorrichtung mit Wärmeverteilungskörper | [1990/03] | English: | Electronic package with heat spreader member | [1990/03] | French: | Ensemble électronique avec corps dissipateur de chaleur | [1990/03] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/28] | 04.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.1995 | CH | 09.08.1995 | ES | 09.08.1995 | LI | 09.08.1995 | NL | 09.08.1995 | SE | 09.11.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
CH | 09.08.1995 | ||
ES | 09.08.1995 | ||
LI | 09.08.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
CH | 09.08.1995 | ||
LI | 09.08.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 09.08.1995 | |
SE | 09.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP60062141 ; | [Y]JP61134045 ; | [Y]JP61168946 ; | [A]JP60143653 ; | [A]JP61145266 ; | [X]FR2555812 (NEC CORP [JP]) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 30, no. 10, March 1988, NEW YORK US pages 310 - 311; "Thermal enhancement and mechanical protection cover" | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 193 (E-334)(1916) 09 August 1985, & JP-A-60 062 141 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) 10 April 1985, & JP60062141 A 19850410 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 329 (E-452)(2385) 08 November 1986, & JP-A-61 134 045 (NEC CORPORATION) 21 June 1986, & JP61134045 A 19860621 | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 24, no. 1A, June 1981, NEW YORK US page 14 W.A.Campo et al.: "Heat spreader with thermal grease" | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 376 (E-464)(2433) 13 December 1986, & JP-A-61 168 946 (HITACHI) 30 July 1986, & JP61168946 A 19860730 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 20, no. 4, September 1977, NEW YORK US page 1433 V.Y.DOO et al.: "Controlled gap in semiconductor packages" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 305 (E-363)(2028) 03 December 1985, & JP-A-60 143 653 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) 29 July 1985, & JP60143653 A 19850729 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 339 (C-385)(2395) 15 November 1986, & JP-A-61 145 266 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND) 02 July 1986, & JP61145266 A 19860702 | [XP] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 31, no. 3, August 1988, NEW YORK US pages 451 - 452; "Low-cost,high-power,multi-chip module design" | Examination | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 30, no. 10, March 1988, New York, US, pp. 310-311; "Thermal enhancement and mechanical protection cover" | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 1A, June 1981, New York, US, p. 14, W.A. CAMPO et al.: "Heat spreader with thermal grease" | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 31, no. 3, August 1988, New York, US, pp. 451-452; "Low-cost, high-power, multi-chip module design" | - VLSI Technology, ed. by S.M. Sze, McGraw-Hill Book Company, 1st ed. 1983, pp. 559-560 | - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, vol. 21, no. 6, Nov. 1978, Armonk, New York, US, p. 2430; E.G. Loeffel and A.W. Rzant: "Heat transfer apparatus for semiconductor chip". |