EP0342620 - Agent for prevention and remedy of injuries caused by ischemia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0071 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | For all designated states NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bando, Ko 6506 Copper Ridge Drive T No. 1 Baltimore Maryland 21209 / US | 02 /
Senoo, Yoshimasa 316-8, Akoda Okayama-shi Okayama-ken / JP | 03 /
Noji, Minoru 2-11-6, Shiroyama-cho Takasaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Ootsuki, Kazuo 3-17-10, Shimo Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Ekimoto, Hisao 2-11-1-803, Shimo Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Irie, Yukio 2-3, Shimokawa-cho Maebashi-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108814.8 | 17.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | JP19880119155 | 18.05.1988 Original published format: JP 11915588 | [1989/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0342620 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0342620 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/50, A61K9/10 | [1989/47] | CPC: |
A61K38/446 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
Y10S436/829 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/47] | Title | German: | Mittel zur Vorbeugung und Abhilfe gegen ischämische Verletzungen | [1989/47] | English: | Agent for prevention and remedy of injuries caused by ischemia | [1989/47] | French: | Agent de prévention et de traitement de blessures causées par l'ischémie | [1989/47] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 30.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 17.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63077824 ; | [X]JP62215532 ; | [A]EP0200467 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]); | [A]WO8701387 (SYN TEK AB [SE]) | [X] - DERWENT ACCESSION, NO. 88-136 325, Questel Tele-systems (WPIL), DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London, GB; & JP-A-63 077 824 (TOYO SODA MFG KK), & JP63077824 A 00000000 | [X] - DERWENT ACCESSION, NO. 87-304 307, Questel Tele-systems (WPIL), DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London, GB; & JP-A-62 215 532 (UBE INDUSTRIES KK), & JP62215532 A 00000000 |