EP0348657 - Force or pressure transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1993 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Kurt Schlossstrasse 55 D-7257 Ditzingen 4 / DE | 02 /
Heinz, Rudolf, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. Eltinger Weg 26 D-7253 Renningen / DE | 03 /
Schoor, Ulrich Tuchbleiche 5 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | 04 /
Wendel, Jürgen Germersheimer Strasse 14 D-7000 Stuttgart 31 / DE | [1990/01] | Application number, filing date | 89108893.2 | 18.05.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | DE19883818191 | 28.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3818191 | [1990/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348657 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348657 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/06, G01L1/18 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
G01L1/18 (EP);
G01L9/0002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/01] | Title | German: | Druck- oder Kraftsensor | [1990/01] | English: | Force or pressure transducer | [1990/01] | French: | Capteur de force ou de pression | [1990/01] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/44] | 01.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/25] | 02.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/23] | 11.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2187887 ; | [Y]DE2730764 |