EP0342694 - Optical polarisation diversity receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibutani, Makoto c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89109036.7 | 19.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | JP19880123143 | 20.05.1988 Original published format: JP 12314388 | [1989/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0342694 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0342694 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0342694 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/06 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
H04B10/61 (EP,US);
H04B10/614 (EP,US);
H04B10/64 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/47] | H04B9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/47] | Title | German: | Optischer Polarisations-Diversitäts-Empfänger | [1989/47] | English: | Optical polarisation diversity receiver | [1989/47] | French: | Récepteur optique à diversité de polarisation | [1989/47] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 14.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 15.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.03.1994 | [2015/21] |
Former [1995/07] | FR | 26.08.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE 1988 TECHNICAL DIGEST SERIES vol. 1, January 1988, NEW ORLEANS US ENNING ET AL: 'Polarization-diversity receiver for 560-Mbit/s ASK heterodyne detection' paper TU15 | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS. vol. 22, no. 1, 2 January 1986, STEVENAGE GB pages 9 - 11; DAVIS ET AL: 'Coherent Optical Receiver for 680 Mbit/s Using Phase Diversity' | [A] - 1986 OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE TECHNICAL DIGEST February 1986, ATLANTA US pages 56 - 58; PARK ET AL: 'Performance of ASK Heterodyne detection for various laser linewidths' paper TUL6 |