EP0346645 - Use of an age-hardenable copper-based alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KM-kabelmetal Aktiengesellschaft Klosterstr. 29 D-49074 Osnabrück / DE | [1989/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gravemann, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. Zum Schäferhof 20 D-4500 Osnabrück / DE | [1989/51] | Application number, filing date | 89109136.5 | 20.05.1989 | [1989/51] | Priority number, date | DE19883820203 | 14.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3820203 | [1989/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346645 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346645 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
B22D11/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/51] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer aushärtbaren Kupferlegierung | [1989/51] | English: | Use of an age-hardenable copper-based alloy | [1989/51] | French: | Utilisation d'un alliage à base de cuivre durcissable par vieillissement | [1989/51] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 28.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61170532 ; | [A]JP62182239 ; | [AD]US3955615 (DOMPAS JOHN M A, et al); | [A]GB2099339 (LIEGE USINES CUIVRE ZINC) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 377 (C-392)[2434], 16. Dezember 1986, Seite 67 C 392; & JP-A-61 170 532 (KOBE STEEL LTD) 01-08-1986, & JP61170532 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 12, Nr. 33 (C-472)[2880], 30. Juni 1988, Seite 126 C 472; & JP-A-62 182 239 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP.) 10-08-1987, & JP62182239 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 209 (C-186)[1353], 14. September 1983, Seite 41 C 186 (CHIYUUETSU GOUKIN CHIYUUKOU K.K.) 27-06-1983 |