EP0348666 - Anisotropic melt-forming polycarbonates and method for making [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.1995 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schissel, David Neal 1806 Huntridge Drive Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1990/01] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89109277.7 | 23.05.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | US19880212632 | 28.06.1988 Original published format: US 212632 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348666 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348666 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348666 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/04, C08G64/30 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
C08G64/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/01] | Title | German: | Anisotrope schmelzbildende Polycarbonate und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1990/01] | English: | Anisotropic melt-forming polycarbonates and method for making | [1990/01] | French: | Polycarbonates anisotropes formant des masses fondues et procédé pour leur préparation | [1990/01] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 13.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63010623 ; | [AD]JP61264020 ; | [A]EP0015856 (RHONE POULENC IND [FR]); | [AD]US4543313 (MAHABADI HADI-KHAN [CA], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 209, 15th June 1988; & JP-A-63 010 623 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD) 18-01-1988, & JP63010623 A 00000000 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 124, 17th April 1987; & JP-A-61 264 020 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD) 21-11-1986, & JP61264020 A 00000000 |