EP0345537 - Automatic safety clutch for rotation transmission between shafts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATEC-Weiss GmbH & Co. KG Von-Siemens-Strasse 1 48691 Vreden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states ATEC-Weiss GmbH & Co. KG Von-Siemens-Strasse 1 D-48691 Vreden / DE | ||
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states ATEC-Weiss KG Von-Siemens-Strasse 1 D-4426 Vreden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiss, Hermann Eibergener Strasse 18 D-4426 Vreden / DE | 02 /
Weiss, Rudolf Händelstrasse 13 D-4426 Vreden / DE | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1989/50] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 89109361.9 | 24.05.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | DE19883819481 | 08.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3819481 | [1989/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0345537 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0345537 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16D43/20, F16F1/34 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
F16D43/2024 (EP,US);
F16F1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Freischaltsicherheitskupplung für die Übertragung von Drehbewegungen zwischen Wellen | [1989/50] | English: | Automatic safety clutch for rotation transmission between shafts | [1989/50] | French: | Embrayage automatique de sécurité pour la transmission de rotation entre arbres | [1989/50] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 08.01.1992 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1512760 (RICHARD HANCOCK PHILIP); | [A]DE896277 (LUHN & PULVERMACHER K G); | [A]CH395651 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]); | [Y]US3261598 (ROGER JONES JOHN) |