EP0343651 - Method and device for the decorative machining of glass and ceramics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states "LADEC" Co. Swoboda Bul. 48, et. 8, Whg. 22 BG-400 Plovdiv / BG | [1992/19] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states PU "PAISSII HILENDARSKI" Tzar-Assen-Strasse 24 4000 Plovdiv / BG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dimitrov, Dimiter Angelov 48, Boul Malchika App. 22 BG-4002 Plovdiv / BG | 02 /
Dakov, Mincho Stanev Komplex Trakia Bl. 210-A App. 20 BG-4002 Plovdiv / BG | 03 /
Tonchev, Dancho Tonchev Studentsko Gradche "Hr. Botev" Bl. 16, st. BG-1310 Sofia / BG | 04 /
Kalafirov, Hristo Andonov BG-4108 Markovo-Village Distrikt Plovdiv / BG | 05 /
Botev, Todor Stefanov 18a, Bresovska Strasse BG-4000 Plovdiv / BG | 06 /
Shterev, Krassimir Emilov Komplex Trakia Block 33A App. 67 Plovdiv / BG | 07 /
Kojuharov, Vladimir Stoyanov 35-43A, P. Enev Strasse BG-1126 Sofia / BG | 08 /
Dimitrov, Yordan Ivanov Komplex Mladost-2 Block 226 A BG-1199 Sofia / BG | 09 /
Tzvetkov, Dimiter Velikov Jelesni Vrata Strasse 26A App. 41 Varna / BG | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Ebbinghaus, Dieter, et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | Ebbinghaus, Dieter, et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89109418.7 | 24.05.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | BG19880084291 | 27.05.1988 Original published format: BG 8429188 | [1989/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0343651 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C03C23/00, B23K26/00, H01S3/097 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
B23K26/0661 (EP,US);
B23K26/0006 (EP,US);
B23K26/06 (EP,US);
B23K26/0643 (EP,US);
B23K26/0665 (EP,US);
B23K26/3576 (EP,US);
B23K26/40 (EP,US);
B23K37/0452 (EP,US);
B41M1/34 (EP,US);
B44B7/00 (EP,US);
B44C1/005 (EP,US);
B44C1/228 (EP,US);
C03C23/0025 (EP,US);
C04B41/0036 (EP,US);
C04B41/80 (EP,US);
B23K2101/007 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US);
B23K2103/52 (EP,US);
B23K2103/54 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, SE [1989/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur dekorativen Bearbeitung von Glas und Keramik | [1989/48] | English: | Method and device for the decorative machining of glass and ceramics | [1989/48] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement décoratif de verres et céramiques | [1989/48] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 11.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1294359 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]FR2267288 (CLIGNET JEAN LOUIS [FR]); | [A]GB2160196 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, Bände 38,39, Teil II, Mai/Juni 1980, North-Holland- Amsterdam, NL Seiten 891-895 | [AD] - SILIKATTECHNIK, Heft 5, 1984, VEB VERLAG FÜR BAUWESEN, Berlin, DE SEITEN 146-148 |