EP0346667 - Solutions of permonosulphuric acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.11.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro-Image Technology Limited 3 Bedford Square London WC1B 3RA / GB | [1989/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lapham, David John 12 Bosley Mews Pinglewick Hamlet Belper Derbyshire DE5 1BU / GB | 02 /
Troughton, Nicholas Arador 4 Beaconsfield Road Widnes Cheshire / GB | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | ffrench-Lynch, Cecil, et al Laporte plc Group Patent Department, P.O. Box 8 Laporte House Kingsway Luton Bedfordshire LU4 8EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | ffrench-Lynch, Cecil, et al Laporte plc Group Patent Department PO Box 8 Laporte House Kingsway Luton, Bedfordshire LU4 8EW / GB | Application number, filing date | 89109587.9 | 27.05.1989 | [1989/51] | Priority number, date | GB19880013889 | 11.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8813889 | [1989/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346667 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/26 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
G03F7/423 (EP,US);
C01B17/69 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/51] | Title | German: | Peroxymonoschwefelsäurelösungen | [1989/51] | English: | Solutions of permonosulphuric acid | [1989/51] | French: | Solutions d'acide permonosulfurique | [1989/51] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/02] | 29.08.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0256284 (MICRO IMAGE TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]); | [X]GB734467 (FMC CORP); | [Y]EP0097305 (FMC CORP [US]) | [Y] - W.C. SCHUMB et al.: "Hydrogen Peroxide", 1955, pages 535-547, Reinhold Publishing Corp., New York, US |