EP0345602 - Method and apparatus for minimizing foam in filling cartons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Alfa Holdings S.A. 70, Avenue Général-Guisan 1009 Pully / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states Tetra Alfa Holdings S.A. 70, Avenue Général-Guisan CH-1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states Tetra Pak Holdings & Finance S.A. 70, Avenue C.-F. Ramuz CH-1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states Tetra Pak Holdings & Finance S.A. 70, Avenue C.-F. Ramuz CH-1009 Pully / CH | ||
For all designated states Kelash, Dale J. 8655 Hunter's Way Apple Valley, Minn. 55124 / US | |||
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states TETRA PAK HOLDINGS & FINANCE SA 70, Avenue C.-F. Ramuz CH-1009 Pully / CH | ||
For all designated states Kelash, Dale J. 8655 Hunter's Way Apple Valley, Minn. 55124 / US | |||
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states Corniea, Donald G. 1286 70th Street Inver Grove, Minn. 55075 / US | ||
For all designated states Kelash, Dale J. 8655 Hunter's Way Apple Valley, Minn. 55124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corniea, Donald G. 1286 70th Street Inver Grove, Minn. 55075 / US | 02 /
Kelash, Dale J. 8655 Hunter's Way Apple Valley, Minn. 55124 / US | [1990/19] |
Former [1989/50] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1990/19] | Weber, Dieter, Dr. Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1989/50] | Weber, Dieter, Dr. Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 89109705.7 | 30.05.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | US19880205271 | 10.06.1988 Original published format: US 205271 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0345602 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0345602 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65B39/02 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
B65B39/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/19] |
Former [1989/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herabsetzen des Schäumens während des Füllens von Schachteln | [1989/50] | English: | Method and apparatus for minimizing foam in filling cartons | [1989/50] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour minimiser la mousse lors du remplissage de cartons | [1989/50] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR, LU | 29.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 11.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.07.1989 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.07.1989 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4402461 (MOSSE RICHARD W E [GB], et al) |