blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0344723

EP0344723 - A vertical jump exercise apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.1995
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES, FR
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wehrell, Michael A.
2648 The Strand Hermosa Beach
California 90254 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]For all designated states
Wehrell, Michael A.
2648 The Strand
Hermosa Beach California 90254 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1989/49]
Representative(s)Liesegang, Roland, et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/23]Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Former [1989/49]Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
W-8000 München 40 / DE
Application number, filing date89109755.230.05.1989
[1989/49]
Priority number, dateUS1988020096401.06.1988         Original published format: US 200964
[1989/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0344723
Date:06.12.1989
Language:EN
[1989/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0344723
Date:27.02.1991
Language:EN
[1991/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0344723
Date:02.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.1991
ClassificationIPC:A63B23/04, A63B21/04, A63B69/00
[1989/49]
CPC:
A63B5/16 (EP,US); A63B21/04 (EP,US); A63B21/154 (EP,US);
A63B21/4009 (EP,US); A63B2023/0411 (EP,US); A63B2071/024 (EP,US);
A63B2071/027 (EP,US); A63B21/00061 (EP,US); A63B21/00069 (EP,US);
A63B21/0442 (EP,US); A63B21/0555 (EP,US); A63B21/0557 (EP,US);
A63B2208/0204 (EP,US); A63B2208/0223 (EP,US); A63B5/00 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1989/49]
TitleGerman:Hochsprung-Übungsgerät[1989/49]
English:A vertical jump exercise apparatus[1989/49]
French:Appareil d'exercice de saut en hauteur[1989/49]
Examination procedure21.06.1991Examination requested  [1991/34]
02.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.08.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.1993Fee for grant paid
22.11.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.12.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.03.1994
CH02.03.1994
DE02.03.1994
ES02.03.1994
FR02.03.1994
IT02.03.1994
LI02.03.1994
[2002/24]
Former [1999/42]AT02.03.1994
CH02.03.1994
DE02.03.1994
IT02.03.1994
LI02.03.1994
Former [1995/02]AT02.03.1994
CH02.03.1994
DE02.03.1994
LI02.03.1994
Former [1994/48]CH02.03.1994
DE02.03.1994
LI02.03.1994
Former [1994/45]DE02.03.1994
Documents cited:Search[AD]US3561758  (HUBER LAURENCE J);
 [AD]US3687450  (SCHOLLMEYER WILLIAM A);
 [AD]US4685670  (ZINKIN HAROLD [US]);
 [A]DE8707106U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.