EP0400178 - Semiconductor device with a passivation layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Gerhard, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Karl-Bröger-Strasse 28 D-8550 Forchheim / DE | [1990/49] | Application number, filing date | 89109837.8 | 31.05.1989 | [1990/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0400178 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400178 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/29 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
H01L23/298 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [1990/49] | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement mit Passivierungsschicht | [1990/49] | English: | Semiconductor device with a passivation layer | [1990/49] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur comprenant une couche de passivation | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU, NL | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 28.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.06.1990 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.1990 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.1990 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.1990 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.1990 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.1990 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1566072 ; | [A]EP0008406 ; | [A]EP0019887 ; | [A]EP0075892 | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, Band ED-26, Nr. 11, November 1979, Seiten 1728-1734, IEEE, New York, US; M.L. TARNG et al.: 'Passivation of p-n junction in crystalline silicon by amorphous silicon' | Examination | - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS 44(1984) June, no. 11, New York USA, pages 1092-1094: "High performance hydrogenated amorphous Si solar cells with graded boron-doped intrinsic layers prepared from disilane at high deposition rates", T. Matsushita et al. |