EP0348688 - Solid pharmaceutical preparation and method of producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makino, Tadashi 12-39-1, Mishimaoka 2-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Doi, Koji 15-16-301, Senriyamahigashi 1-chome Suita-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Matsuoka, Masayoshi 2-9, Habikigaoka 8-chome Habikino-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
Tsuboi, Toshiharu 10-5, Shojakuhonmachi 2-chome Settsu-shi Osaka / JP | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1990/01] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89110019.0 | 02.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | JP19880137925 | 03.06.1988 Original published format: JP 13792588 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348688 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348688 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/00, A61K31/70, A61K47/44, // (A61K31/70, 31:51) | [1992/16] | CPC: |
A61K9/209 (EP,US);
A61K31/66 (KR);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K9/2013 (EP,US);
A61K9/2031 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/01] | A61K47/00, A61K31/70, // (A61K31/70, 31:51) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/01] | Title | German: | Feste pharmazeutische Zubereitung und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben | [1990/01] | English: | Solid pharmaceutical preparation and method of producing same | [1990/01] | French: | Préparation pharmaceutique solide et procédé d'obtention de celle-ci | [1990/01] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 08.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0254978 [ ] (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) | [ ] - Dictionnaire Vidal, 1961, page 1878, Office de Vulgarisation Pharmaceutique, Paris, FR; page 1878 "Vitathion a l'Atp". | [ ] - Rote Liste, 1987, Editio Cantor, Aulendorf, DE, No. 67 256 "Corneal-Augentropfen Thilo"; No. 67 260 "Phakosklerom". |