EP0353420 - Air duct system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nieberding, Jean-Louis Hermann Frepert 82 B-4729 Hauset / BE | [1990/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | von Creytz, Dietrich Tannenweg 25 41844 Wegberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | von Creytz, Dietrich, Dipl.-Phys. Tannenweg 25 D-41844 Wegberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89110266.7 | 07.06.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | DE19883822703 | 05.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3822703 | DE19883822704 | 05.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3822704 | [1990/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0353420 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0353420 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353420 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F26B21/04 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
F26B21/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/06] | Title | German: | Luftkanalsystem | [1990/06] | English: | Air duct system | [1990/06] | French: | Système de conduit d'air | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 21.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.05.1992 | ES | 20.05.1992 | GB | 20.05.1992 | IT | 20.05.1992 | NL | 20.05.1992 | AT | 07.06.1992 | CH | 30.06.1992 | LI | 30.06.1992 | FR | 09.10.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 20.05.1992 | |
GB | 20.05.1992 | ||
IT | 20.05.1992 | ||
NL | 20.05.1992 | ||
AT | 07.06.1992 | ||
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
FR | 09.10.1992 | ||
Former [1994/25] | BE | 20.05.1992 | |
GB | 20.05.1992 | ||
NL | 20.05.1992 | ||
AT | 07.06.1992 | ||
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
FR | 09.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/46] | BE | 20.05.1992 | |
GB | 20.05.1992 | ||
NL | 20.05.1992 | ||
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
FR | 09.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | BE | 20.05.1992 | |
NL | 20.05.1992 | ||
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
FR | 09.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | BE | 20.05.1992 | |
NL | 20.05.1992 | ||
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | NL | 20.05.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2524102 (LEISENBERG MANFRED IND KG); | [Y]DE3012458 (METZGER & BECKER GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB686816 (ROBERT AEBI AND CIE A G); | [A]DE341179 (KURD VON HAKEN) |