EP0347645 - Monitoring a plurality of parameters from identical processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellows, James Christopher 2463 Fieldingwood Road Maitland Florida 32751 / US | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89110293.1 | 07.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | US19880209818 | 22.06.1988 Original published format: US 209818 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0347645 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0347645 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/20, G06F15/74 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
G05B23/0237 (EP,US);
G06F11/30 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1989/52] | G06F15/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Überwachung einer Mehrzahl von Parametern von identischen Verfahren | [1989/52] | English: | Monitoring a plurality of parameters from identical processes | [1989/52] | French: | Surveillance d'une pluralité de paramètres de procédés identiques | [1989/52] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 04.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/25] | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4644479 (KEMPER CHRISTIAN T [US], et al); | [A]US4001785 (MIYAZAKI KEN, et al); | [A]US4718025 (MINOR PAUL S [US], et al) |