EP0345780 - Hollow fiber type blood purification apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1994 [1994/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKKISO CO., LTD. No. 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states NIKKISO CO., LTD. No. 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiba, Toshiaki 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89110390.5 | 08.06.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | JP19880142621 | 09.06.1988 Original published format: JP 14262188 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0345780 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0345780 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0345780 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/18, B01D61/00 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
B01D69/08 (EP,US);
A61M1/16 (EP);
B01D63/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/50] | A61M1/18, B01D13/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Hohlfaser-Blutreinigungsvorrichtung | [1989/50] | English: | Hollow fiber type blood purification apparatus | [1989/50] | French: | Appareil de purification du sang du type à fibres creuses | [1989/50] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4024059 (SAUSSE ANDRE); | [A]US4402940 (NOSE YUKIHIKO [US], et al); | [A]EP0249189 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) |