EP0345782 - Fluid analysis with particulate reagent suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SARASEP, INC. 12295 Woodside Drive Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | [1989/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gjerde, Douglas Thomas 12295 Woodside Drive Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 02 /
Benson, James V. 4255 Garlan Avenue Reno, NV 89509 / US | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 D-80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/50] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold, Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert, Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89110394.7 | 08.06.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | US19880204073 | 08.06.1988 Original published format: US 204073 | US19890357514 | 26.05.1989 Original published format: US 357514 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0345782 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0345782 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/84, G01N30/96, G01N30/00 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
G01N30/84 (EP,US);
G01N2030/621 (EP,US);
G01N2030/8435 (EP,US);
G01N2030/965 (EP,US);
G01N27/447 (EP,US);
G01N30/02 (EP,US);
G01N30/64 (EP,US);
G01N35/085 (EP,US);
Y10T436/117497 (EP,US);
Y10T436/255 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
G01N30/02, B01D15/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/50] | G01N30/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsanalyse mit einer Teilchen-Reagens-Suspension | [1989/50] | English: | Fluid analysis with particulate reagent suspension | [1989/50] | French: | Analyse des fluides avec une suspension de réactifs particulaires | [1989/50] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/51] | 20.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58210563 ; | [X]US4357143 (SCOTT RICHARD L) | [A] - TrAC (TRENDS IN ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY), vol. 7, no. 3, March 1988, pages 106-110, Amsterdam, NL; J.T. STEWART et al.: "An update on post-column derivatization methodology in high-performance liquid chromatography" | [A] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 59, no. 1, 1st January 1987, pages 85-90, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US; R.M. CASSIDY et al.: "Performance of annular membrane and screen-tee reactors for postcolumn-reaction detection of metal ions separated by liquid chromatography" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 60 (P-262)[1497], 22nd March 1984; & JP-A-58 210 563 (SHIMAZU SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 07-12-1983, & JP58210563 A 00000000 |