EP0346779 - Projectile for practice [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIEHL GMBH & CO. Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states DIEHL GMBH & CO. Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [1989/51] | Application number, filing date | 89110510.8 | 10.06.1989 | [1989/51] | Priority number, date | DE19880007701U | 14.06.1988 Original published format: DE 8807701 U | [1989/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346779 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346779 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F42B8/00 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
F42B8/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/51] | F42B13/20, F42B8/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1989/51] | Title | German: | Übungsgeschoss | [1989/51] | English: | Projectile for practice | [1989/51] | French: | Projectile d'exercice | [1989/51] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 31.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 28.10.1992 | [1993/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2364427 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]); | [Y]BE662881 ; | [Y]EP0036232 (HERSTAL SA [BE]); | [Y]DE3044098 (SEMPERIT GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE2639884 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [A]US4589342 (ROUSSEAU DAVID G [US]); | [A]FR2114879 (OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG); | [A]US4465464 (SCHOENBERG GEORGE R [US]) |