EP0346844 - Optical head apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirose, Yutaka c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamanaka, Yutaka c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89110712.0 | 13.06.1989 | [1989/51] | Priority number, date | JP19880147241 | 14.06.1988 Original published format: JP 14724188 | JP19880147243 | 14.06.1988 Original published format: JP 14724388 | JP19880164025 | 29.06.1988 Original published format: JP 16402588 | JP19880164026 | 29.06.1988 Original published format: JP 16402688 | JP19880164027 | 29.06.1988 Original published format: JP 16402788 | JP19880164029 | 29.06.1988 Original published format: JP 16402988 | JP19880245063 | 28.09.1988 Original published format: JP 24506388 | [1989/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0346844 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0346844 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346844 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/125, G11B7/13, G11B7/135, G11B7/18 | [1991/28] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B7/00 (EP,US);
G11B7/005 (EP,US);
G11B7/12 (EP,US);
G11B7/128 (EP,US);
G11B7/1365 (EP,US);
G11B7/1381 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/51] | G11B7/12, G11B7/135 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1989/51] | Title | German: | Optische Kopfanordnung | [1989/51] | English: | Optical head apparatus | [1989/51] | French: | Dispositif de tête optique | [1989/51] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/38: Teilanmeldung 94120116.2 eingereicht am 13/06/89 | EPB 1995/38: Divisional application 94120116.2 filed on 13/06/89 | EPB 1995/38: Demande divisionnaire 94120116.2 déposée le 13/06/89 | Examination procedure | 07.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 16.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94120116.2 / EP0646911 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP58064650 [ ]; | [X]US4179708 (FIRESTER ARTHUR H [US], et al); | [Y]EP0078580 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [Y]US4546460 (ANDO HIDEO [JP]); | [X]EP0184750 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0195657 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0229035 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 156 (P-209)[1301], 8th July 1983; & JP-A-58 064 650 (MANSEI KOGYO K.K.) 18-04-1983, Whole abstract., & JP58064650 A 00000000 |