EP0402506 - Driven spindle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Th. Kieserling & Albrecht GmbH & Co. Birkenweiher 66 42651 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states Th. Kieserling & Albrecht GmbH & Co. Birkenweiher 66 D-42651 Solingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glomb, Reiner, Dipl.-Ing. Krankenhausstrasse 10 D-5620 Velbert / DE | 02 /
Maresch, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Klemens-Horn-Strasse 38 D-5650 Solingen / DE | 03 /
Wagner, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Hasselstrasse 137 D-5650 Solingen / DE | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | Stachow, Ernst-Walther, et al Lippert, Stachow & Partner Kölner Strasse 8 42651 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Stachow, Ernst-Walther, Prof. Dr., et al Patentantwälte, Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Kölner Strasse 8 D-42651 Solingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89110865.6 | 15.06.1989 | [1990/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0402506 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0402506 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/00, B23B29/034 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
B23B29/03446 (EP,US);
B23B29/24 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0035 (EP,US);
F16C25/08 (EP,US);
F16C2322/39 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2527 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2529 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/51] | Title | German: | Drehangetriebene Spindel | [1990/51] | English: | Driven spindle | [1990/51] | French: | Broche entraînée | [1990/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, GR, LU, NL | 16.11.1990 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 11.12.1990 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 13.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.07.1990 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.1990 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.1990 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.1990 | 10.07.1990 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.1990 | 04.07.1990 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.1990 | 04.07.1990 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.1990 | 10.07.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.1990 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.1990 | 10.07.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.1990 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.1990 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.08.1996 | ES | 21.08.1996 | FR | 21.08.1996 | GB | 21.08.1996 | GR | 21.08.1996 | IT | 21.08.1996 | NL | 21.08.1996 | SE | 21.11.1996 | [2008/01] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
ES | 21.08.1996 | ||
FR | 21.08.1996 | ||
GB | 21.08.1996 | ||
GR | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
NL | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
ES | 21.08.1996 | ||
GB | 21.08.1996 | ||
GR | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
NL | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
FR | 17.01.1997 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
ES | 21.08.1996 | ||
GB | 21.08.1996 | ||
GR | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
FR | 17.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
GB | 21.08.1996 | ||
GR | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
FR | 17.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
GB | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
FR | 17.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/36] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
GB | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
FR | 17.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/32] | GB | 21.08.1996 | |
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
FR | 17.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/30] | GB | 21.08.1996 | |
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | SE | 21.11.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE444336 ; | [A]GB519866 (RAOUL ROLAND RAYMOND SARAZIN); | [A]EP0044825 (SANDVIK AB [SE]); | [A]US2593124 (GERALD EATON); | [A]FR2545395 (MAUSER WERKE OBERNDORF [DE]); | [A]DE3605850 (GROB GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |