EP0348760 - Process for the production of moulded articles and moulded articles produced according to this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Joachim, Dr. Semmelweisstrasse 135 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 02 /
Rasshofer, Werner, Dr. Leopold-Gmelin-Strasse 31 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | [1990/01] | Application number, filing date | 89111024.9 | 17.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | DE19883822331 | 01.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3822331 | [1990/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348760 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348760 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/00, C08G18/75, C08G18/65, C08G18/32, C08G18/48, C08J5/12, B32B27/00 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B29C51/002 (EP);
B32B27/18 (US);
C08G18/08 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/3212 (EP);
C08G18/3234 (EP);
C08G18/5024 (EP);
C08G18/6505 (EP);
C08G18/73 (EP);
C08G18/75 (EP);
B29C51/14 (EP);
B29K2075/00 (EP);
B29K2105/06 (EP);
B32B2309/02 (US);
B32B2309/12 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/6685 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Formkörpern und die nach diesem Verfahren erhaltenen Formkörper | [1990/01] | English: | Process for the production of moulded articles and moulded articles produced according to this process | [1990/01] | French: | Procédé de préparation de pièces moulées fabriquées selon ce procédé | [1990/01] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.06.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0310896 ; | [AD]DE2164381 ; | [A]US3484412 ; | [A]US4738989 ; | [A]US4705814 ; | [AD]EP0081701 |