EP0347811 - Alkanoic acid derivatives and herbicidal compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome Taitoh-ku Tokyo 110-91 / JP | For all designated states IHARA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome Taitoh-ku Tokyo 110-0008 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome Taitoh-ku Tokyo 110-91 / JP | ||
For all designated states IHARA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY Co., Ltd. 4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome Taitoh-ku, Tokyo 110 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaku, Koichiro 132, Kojima Fukude-cho Iwata-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Wada, Nobuhide 2-4-11, Asahigaoka Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Sugiyama, Kazuhiko 132, Kojima Fukude-cho Iwata-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Takeuchi, Akira 88-2, Tennou-cho Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 05 /
Toyokawa, Yasufumi 1-22-2-1016, Odai Adachi-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Miyazawa, Takeshige 1205-9, Iwaname Daito-cho Ogasa-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 07 /
Yoshida, Ryo 3353, Kamo Kikugawa-cho Ogasa-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111133.8 | 19.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | JP19880150063 | 20.06.1988 Original published format: JP 15006388 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0347811 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347811 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/60, C07D239/34, C07D239/52, C07D251/30, C07D251/26, A01N43/54, A01N43/66 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
A01N43/54 (EP,US);
A01N43/66 (EP,US);
C07D239/34 (EP,US);
C07D239/38 (EP,US);
C07D239/52 (EP,US);
C07D239/60 (EP,US);
C07D251/20 (EP,US);
C07D251/34 (EP,US);
C07D251/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/52] | Title | German: | Alkansäurederivate und herbizide Mittel | [1989/52] | English: | Alkanoic acid derivatives and herbicidal compositions | [1989/52] | French: | Dérivés d'acides alcanoiques et compositions herbicides | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0287079 (KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO [JP], et al); | [AD]DE2314160 (AMERICAN HOME PROD); | [AD]EP0262393 (SHELL AGRAR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |