EP0354986 - A method and circuitry for automatic control, according to the counter principle, of the frequency of a radio telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOKIA-MOBIRA OY Nakolankatu 8 P.O. Box 86 24101 Salo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1990/08] | For all designated states NOKIA-MOBIRA OY Nakolankatu 8 P.O. Box 86 SF-24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ylivakeri, Matti Ruuhikoskenkatu 5 B 2 SF-24240 Salo / FI | [1990/08] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/08] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 D-33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111143.7 | 20.06.1989 | [1990/08] | Priority number, date | FI19880003855 | 19.08.1988 Original published format: FI 883855 | [1990/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354986 | Date: | 21.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354986 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03J7/06 | [1990/08] | CPC: |
H03J7/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltung zur selbsttätigen Steuerung der Frequenz eines Funkfernsprechers nach dem Zähler-Prinzip | [1990/08] | English: | A method and circuitry for automatic control, according to the counter principle, of the frequency of a radio telephone | [1990/08] | French: | Procédé et circuit de commande automatique, selon le principe de comptage, de la fréquence d'un radiotéléphone | [1990/08] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 02.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/25] | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8404637 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [Y]EP0253680 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | [AD]DE3738124 (NOKIA MOBIRA OY [FI]) |