Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] |
12.02.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] |
03.04.1991 | First examination report | |
03.08.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] |
08.01.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] |
23.12.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.1990 [1990/06] |