Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0353440 | Global Dossier | 31.03.1993 | B1 | EP0353440 | 28.02.1990 | A3 | EP0353440 | 07.02.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3822955 | 07.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3822955 | 11.01.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3822955 | 07.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE58903932D1 | 06.05.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3822955 | 07.07.1988 |