EP0353440 - Water evacuating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PASSAVANT-WERKE AG 65322 Aarbergen 7 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states PASSAVANT-WERKE AG D-65322 Aarbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiler, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Wilhelmstrasse 59 D-6252 Diez / DE | [1990/06] | Application number, filing date | 89111203.9 | 20.06.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | DE19883822955 | 07.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3822955 | [1990/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0353440 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0353440 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353440 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/12, E02D29/14 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
E02D29/12 (EP);
E02D29/14 (EP);
E02D29/149 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, LU, NL [1990/06] | Title | German: | Entwässerungsgegenstand | [1990/06] | English: | Water evacuating device | [1990/06] | French: | Dispositif d'évacuation d'eau | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3980311 (DITCHER JOHN); | [XP]EP0278325 (VON ROLL AG [CH]); | [X]DE2244269 (ATHLEY G L E); | [XP]EP0300829 (BOWMAN HAROLD M); | [X]US3926533 (BINETTE ANDRE); | [X]FR2344679 (GIRARD RENE [FR]); | [X]FR2086987 (TUYAUX BONNA); | [A]US3294000 (PELSUE THURMAN A); | [A]GB1434670 (WAVIN BV) |