EP0347895 - Method for preparing a particulate material comprising a platinum-containing hydrosilylation catalyst and a silicone resin. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/52] | Particulate material comprising a platinum-containing hydrosilylation catalyst and a silicone resin | ||
[1993/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY SILICONE COMPANY, LIMITED 2-3-16, Muro-machi Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states TORAY SILICONE COMPANY, LIMITED 2-3-16, Muro-machi Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atasushi, Togashi 6,1-chome, Yushudai nishi Ichihara-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Toshio, Saruyama 3-11-13-1101 Tsudanuma Narashino-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Spott, Gottfried, et al Spott & Weinmiller Patentanwälte Fasanenstrasse 159 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Spott, Gottfried, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Spott, Weinmiller & Partner Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111335.9 | 22.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | JP19880155964 | 23.06.1988 Original published format: JP 15596488 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0347895 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0347895 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347895 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, C08K9/10, C08J3/12 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
C08J3/16 (EP);
C08J3/07 (EP);
C08K9/10 (EP);
C08L83/04 (EP);
C08G77/12 (EP);
C08G77/20 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K9/10, C08L83/04 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/52 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1989/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von teilchenförmigen Zusammensetzungn auf Basis eines Platin enthaltenden Hydrosilylierungskatalysators und eines Silikonharzes | [1993/46] | English: | Method for preparing a particulate material comprising a platinum-containing hydrosilylation catalyst and a silicone resin. | [1993/46] | French: | Procédé de préparation des compositions en forme de particules comprenant un catalyseur d'hydrosilation à base de platine et une résine de silicone | [1993/46] |
Former [1989/52] | Teilchenförmige Zusammensetzung auf Basis eines Platin enthaltenden Hydrosilylierungskatalysators und eines Silikonharzes | ||
Former [1989/52] | Particulate material comprising a platinum-containing hydrosilylation catalyst and a silicone resin | ||
Former [1989/52] | Composition en forme de particules comprenant un catalyseur d'hydrosilylation à base de platine et une résine de silicone | Examination procedure | 02.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 14.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0072474 ; | [AP]EP0300645 |