Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3822943 | 11.01.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3822943 | 07.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0355317 | Global Dossier | 18.04.1990 | A3 | EP0355317 | 28.02.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3919512 | 15.06.1989 | DE3822943 | 07.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3919512 | 20.12.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3919512 | 15.06.1989 | DE3822943 | 07.07.1988 |