EP0349883 - Method and device for the transfer of a medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIRMA GERHARD KLEMM MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. Friedrich-Hagemann-Strasse 64 D-33719 Bielefeld / DE | [1990/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klemm, Gerhard Am Rehwinkel 37 D-4800 Bielefeld 1 / DE | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Bodo Thielking Dipl.-Ing. Otto Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 20 D-33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111646.9 | 27.06.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | DE19883823200 | 08.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3823200 | [1990/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0349883 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0349883 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349883 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41F15/08, B41F15/42 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
B41F15/0854 (EP,US);
B41F15/0845 (EP,US);
B41F15/20 (EP,US);
B41F15/423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auftragen von Medien | [1990/02] | English: | Method and device for the transfer of a medium | [1990/02] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour le transfert d'un milieu | [1990/02] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 15.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.1992 | 30.06.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3103421 (KLEMM GERHARD [DE]); | [A]DE3207403 (FLEISCHLE RUDOLF) | Examination | US3848528 | US3577914 |